blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0873495


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2008  [2008/07]
17.02.2006 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
11.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
17.05.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2002  [2002/27]
22.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2002  [2002/15]
11.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2001 [2001/26]
02.03.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.04.2001 [2001/16]
16.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
03.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
01.02.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.01.2000 Renewal fee
12.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
12.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
10.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
18.03.1999 Examination report or reply
25.01.1999 Renewal fee
23.12.1998 First examination report
18.12.1998 Examination report or reply
11.09.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.10.1998 [1998/44]
11.09.1998 Request for examination filed published on  28.10.1998 [1998/44]
21.08.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
27.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication