Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0873495

EP0873495 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF AMMUNITION TYPE, AND THE USE THEREROF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Isachsen, Oyvind
Niels Juels gt. 38
0257 Oslo / NO
[1998/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/44]
Representative(s)Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/44]Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97901277.015.01.1997
[1998/44]
WO1997NO00012
Priority number, dateNO1996000016415.01.1996         Original published format: NO 960164
[1998/44]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9726502
Date:24.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0873495
Date:28.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997
[1998/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0873495
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE24.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:F42B35/00, B07C5/10
[1998/44]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN FESTSTELLUNG DER MUNITIONSSORTE UND DIE ANWENDUNG DAVON[1998/44]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF AMMUNITION TYPE, AND THE USE THEREROF[1998/44]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LA DETERMINATION AUTOMATIQUE DU TYPE DE MUNITION, ET UTILISATION DE CE PROCEDE ET DE CE SYSTEME[1998/44]
Entry into regional phase24.07.1997Translation filed 
13.08.1998National basic fee paid 
13.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/44]
23.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2000Fee for grant paid
17.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
IT19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
GB15.01.2001
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
GB15.01.2001
Former [2003/09]ES19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
GB15.01.2001
Former [2002/27]ES19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
GB15.01.2001
Former [2002/15]SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
GB15.01.2001
Former [2001/26]SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/16]FR15.09.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US5157486  (BAIRD RANDY K [US], et al);
 [A]US5233125  (BOUVET GERARD [FR], et al);
 [A]US4923066  (OPHIR ZOHAR [IL], et al);
 [A]DE3943206  (ELOR OPTRONICS LTD [IL])