Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0898521

EP0898521 - HAZARD WARNING SYSTEM FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2001
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Safi, Mondher
24 Avenue de la Sabliere, Z.I.
91150 Etampes / FR
[1999/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Pontet, Bernard , et al
Pontet Allano & Associés
Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon
CS 70003 Saint Aubin
91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Pontet, Bernard , et al
Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25 rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date97901673.024.01.1997
[1999/09]
WO1997FR00149
Priority number, dateFR1996000077924.01.1996         Original published format: FR 9600779
[1999/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9727078
Date:31.07.1997
Language:FR
[1997/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0898521
Date:03.03.1999
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997
[1999/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0898521
Date:04.10.2000
Language:FR
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/30
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/09]
TitleGerman:WARNBLINKLICHTVERFAHREN FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[1999/09]
English:HAZARD WARNING SYSTEM FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[1999/09]
French:SYSTEME DE SIGNALISATION DE DETRESSE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[1999/09]
Entry into regional phase10.11.1998National basic fee paid 
10.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
22.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2000Fee for grant paid
11.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.09.1998DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.1998
30.09.1998ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.1998
30.09.1998FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.1998
30.09.1998GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.1998
30.09.1998IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.11.1998
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.09.1998M01   Fee paid on   10.11.1998
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199903   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.1999
31.01.200004   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
IT04.10.2000
DE05.01.2001
[2008/07]
Former [2002/27]ES04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
DE05.01.2001
Former [2002/14]GB04.10.2000
DE05.01.2001
Former [2001/28]GB04.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US5237306  (ADELL ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-5,9-12 * column 9, line 3 - line 42; figures 4,19-25,33-37 *;
 [X]US5113175  (ADELL ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-5,7-12 * column A; figures 1,5,8,9 *;
 [X]US4896137  (LEE III ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column A; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5410294  (GOLD PETER [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *;
 [A]DE3620599  (WALTER HERMANN DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *