EP1012669 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THERMALLY PROCESSING AN IMAGING MATERIAL EMPLOYING MEANS FOR BENDING THE IMAGING MATERIAL DURING THERMAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRUBLE, Kent, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MCDANIEL, David, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
PRESZLER, Duane, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
LUNDE, George, G. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/13] | Parent, Yves KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97901940.3 | 08.01.1997 | [2000/26] | WO1997US00240 | Priority number, date | US19960594649 | 02.02.1996 Original published format: US 594649 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728489 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012669 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012669 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03D13/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G03D13/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG VON BILDMATERIAL MIT MITTELN ZUM KRÜMMEN DES BILDMATERIALS WÄHREND DER WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG | [2003/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THERMALLY PROCESSING AN IMAGING MATERIAL EMPLOYING MEANS FOR BENDING THE IMAGING MATERIAL DURING THERMAL PROCESSING | [2000/26] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE D'UN MATERIAU D'IMAGERIE QUI FONT APPEL A UN SYSTEME DE COURBURE DUDIT MATERIAU LORS DU TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/26] | GERAET UND VERFAHREN ZUR WAERMEBEHANDLUNG VON BILDMATERIAL MIT MITTELN ZUM KRUEMMEN DES BILDMATERIALS WAEHREND DER WAERMEBEHANDLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.1998 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 12.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9303422 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-5 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO9320480 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [D]US5352863 (SVENDSEN JOHN [US]); | [PA]US5502532 (BIESINGER MARK G [US], et al) [PA] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE4436177 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]US5463444 (WATANABE NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE1797164 (RICOH) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |