Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0938409

EP0938409 - PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR COMPRISING A LASER IMAGEABLE TUNED OPTICAL CAVITY THIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/35]LASER IMAGEABLE TUNED OPTICAL CAVITY THIN FILM AND PRINTING PLATE INCORPORATING THE SAME
[2004/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRESSTEK, INC.
55 Executive Drive
Hudson, New Hampshire 03051 / US
[2004/45]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
PRESSTEK, INC.
8 Commercial Street
Hudson, New Hampshire 03051 / US
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
FLEX PRODUCTS, INC.
1402 Mariner Way
Santa Rosa, CA 95407-7370 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIS, Gregory, F.
16100 Rio Nido Road
Guerneville, CA 95466 / US
02 / BRADLEY, Richard, A., Jr.
1436 Lawrence Way
Santa Rosa, CA 95401 / US
03 / FISHER, Shari, P.
1174 Halyard Drive
Santa Rosa, CA 95401 / US
04 / PHILLIPS, Roger, W.
466 Jacqueline Drive
Santa Rosa, CA 95405 / US
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds
LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/33]Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2000/46]Belcher, Simon James , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [1999/35]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date97901979.115.01.1997
[1999/35]
WO1997US00409
Priority number, dateUS1996060864529.02.1996         Original published format: US 608645
[1999/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9731774
Date:04.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0938409
Date:01.09.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997
[1999/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0938409
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)International search reportUS04.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B32B9/00, B41N1/14
[2004/26]
Former International [1999/35]B32B9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/35]
TitleGerman:FLACHDRUCKPLATTEN-VORLAÜFER MIT EINER MIT LASERBESTRAHLUNG BEBILDBARER MEHRSCHICHTFOLIE MIT OPTISCHEN HOHLRAUM[2004/32]
English:PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR COMPRISING A LASER IMAGEABLE TUNED OPTICAL CAVITY THIN FILM[2004/32]
French:PRECURSEUR DE PLANCHE D'IMPRESSION INCORPORANT UNE COUCHE MINCE DE CAVITE OPTIQUE ACCORDEE PERMETTANT LA FORMATION D'IMAGES LASER[2004/32]
Former [1999/35]LASER-BEBILDBARERE DÜNNE SCHICHT MIT OPTISCHEM HOHLRAUM UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE FLACHDRUCKPLATTE
Former [1999/35]LASER IMAGEABLE TUNED OPTICAL CAVITY THIN FILM AND PRINTING PLATE INCORPORATING THE SAME
Former [1999/35]COUCHE MINCE DE CAVITE OPTIQUE ACCORDEE PERMETTANT LA FORMATIONS D'IMAGES LASER ET PLANCHE D'IMPRESSION INCORPORANT CE TYPE DE COUCHE
Entry into regional phase16.09.1998National basic fee paid 
16.09.1998Search fee paid 
16.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/35]
04.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2004Fee for grant paid
21.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
LU15.01.2005
IE17.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
PT15.05.2005
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]AT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
LU15.01.2005
IE17.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2006/24]AT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
IE17.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
MC31.01.2005
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI15.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0096503  (BURROUGHS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,14 * page 10, line 31 - line 35 * * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 12 * * page 15, line 14 - line 22 * * page 19, line 16 - page 20, line 18; figure - *;
 [X]US4233626  (BELL ALAN E) [X] 1,5,14 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 21; figure - *;
 [PX]US5570636  (LEWIS THOMAS E [US]) [PX] 1,14 * figure 2 *
International search[Y]US5379698
 [Y]US5192626
 [Y]US5188032
ExaminationUS5339737
    Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry; 5th. ed, vol. A13; VCH Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, Weinheim (DE); p. 621-628,