Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0889733 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0889733



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1262
04.03.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
21.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.02.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 36
21.01.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
08.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.01.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 22
02.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.12.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.12.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.12.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 50
13.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Claims Appeal 2
13.12.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 13
13.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
11.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.12.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
16.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.08.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.07.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.10.2012 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
25.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.01.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.01.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.08.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.08.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 40
23.08.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.08.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
12.04.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.04.2010 Claims Appeal 2
01.04.2010 Claims Appeal 2
01.04.2010 Claims Appeal 2
01.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
01.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
01.04.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
11.03.2010 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
29.01.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
25.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.01.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.01.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
17.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.12.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.11.2009 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
23.11.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
23.11.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.11.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
29.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
29.10.2009 Claims Opposition 1
29.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
29.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
29.10.2009 Claims Opposition 2
29.10.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.10.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.10.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 38
28.08.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.08.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.08.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.08.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.08.2009 Claims Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Claims Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Claims Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Claims Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
28.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
28.08.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.08.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
28.08.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
18.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.06.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
25.05.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
25.05.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.04.2008 Claims Opposition 2
14.04.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
14.04.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
11.04.2008 Claims Opposition 2
11.04.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.04.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
07.02.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.12.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
31.10.2007 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
30.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2007 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
25.10.2007 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
02.08.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.08.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.07.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.06.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.06.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.06.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
26.06.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
26.06.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
31.08.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.08.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.08.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
01.08.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 3
27.07.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
28.03.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.03.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.03.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
21.02.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
21.02.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.10.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
31.10.2005 Description Search / examination 4
31.10.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.10.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2005 Description Search / examination 4
27.10.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.03.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
08.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
08.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
08.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
01.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.10.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.08.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.08.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
18.06.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.06.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.06.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.02.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.02.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
06.12.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
30.09.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.09.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.09.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.09.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.10.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
08.10.1998 Description Search / examination 2
08.10.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.10.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
14.09.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
09.09.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.09.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 14
24.03.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
10.02.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
23.09.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.08.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.08.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 34
21.08.1997 Priority document Search / examination 28