Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0879457

EP0879457 - ROAD VEHICLE SENSING APPARATUS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diamond Consulting Services Limited
Chestnut Farm, Dinton Aylesbury
Buckinghamshire HP17 8UG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
Diamond Consulting Services Limited
Chestnut Farm, Dinton
Aylesbury, Buckinghamshire HP17 8UG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / LEES, Richard, Andrew
Chestnut Farm, Dinton, Aylesbury
Buckinghamshire HP17 8UG / GB
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97902476.705.02.1997
[1998/48]
WO1997GB00323
Priority number, dateGB1996000237806.02.1996         Original published format: GB 9602378
[1998/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9729468
Date:14.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0879457
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0879457
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/01
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/48]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN VON STRASSENFAHRZEUGEN UND SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT DAFÜR[1998/48]
English:ROAD VEHICLE SENSING APPARATUS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS THEREFOR[1998/48]
French:DETECTEUR DE VEHICULE ROUTIER ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DES SIGNAUX ASSOCIES[1998/48]
Entry into regional phase28.07.1998National basic fee paid 
28.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
12.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2000Fee for grant paid
01.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00201284.7  / EP1028404
EP05076452.1  / EP1585081
EP10177978.3  / EP2276010
Opposition(s)26.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2000
BE25.10.2000
CH25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
FR25.10.2000
IT25.10.2000
LI25.10.2000
NL25.10.2000
DK25.01.2001
SE25.01.2001
DE26.01.2001
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]AT25.10.2000
BE25.10.2000
CH25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
FR25.10.2000
LI25.10.2000
NL25.10.2000
DK25.01.2001
SE25.01.2001
DE26.01.2001
Former [2003/46]AT25.10.2000
BE25.10.2000
CH25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
LI25.10.2000
NL25.10.2000
DK25.01.2001
SE25.01.2001
DE26.01.2001
FR23.03.2001
Former [2003/09]AT25.10.2000
BE25.10.2000
CH25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
LI25.10.2000
NL25.10.2000
SE25.01.2001
DE26.01.2001
FR23.03.2001
Former [2002/14]AT25.10.2000
BE25.10.2000
CH25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
LI25.10.2000
SE25.01.2001
DE26.01.2001
FR23.03.2001
Former [2002/10]AT25.10.2000
BE25.10.2000
CH25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
LI25.10.2000
SE25.01.2001
FR23.03.2001
Former [2002/02]AT25.10.2000
BE25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
SE25.01.2001
FR23.03.2001
Former [2001/51]AT25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
SE25.01.2001
Former [2001/37]AT25.10.2000
FI25.10.2000
Former [2001/29]FI25.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[YA]FR2463412  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1,4,13,29,31 * figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3,5-12,14,28,30;
 [A]EP0038539  (EVR ELEC VEHICULES RESEAUX [FR]) [A] 1-31 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 12 *;
 [A]US3983531  (CORRIGAN THOMAS B)
 [YA]  - GLEISSNER E, "VON VERKEHRSDURCHSAGE BIS MAUTSTATION", FUNKSCHAU, (19910322), vol. 63, no. 7, pages 73 - 75, 78, XP000224977 [Y] 1,4,13,29,31 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5-12,14,28,30