EP0822213 - POLYESTER, POLYESTER COMPOSITION, POLYESTER LAMINATE, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BIAXIALLY STRETCHED POLYESTER BOTTLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMACHI, Koji, Mitsui Petrochemical Ind. Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 02 /
KOUYA, Masahiro, Mitsui Petrochemical Ind. Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 03 /
HIRAOKA, Shoji, Mitsui Petrochemical Ind. Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97902717.4 | 18.02.1997 | [1998/06] | WO1997JP00427 | Priority number, date | JP19960033936 | 21.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3393696 | JP19960096981 | 18.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9698196 | JP19960206289 | 06.08.1996 Original published format: JP 20628996 | [1998/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731050 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822213 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/66, C08G63/672, C08L67/02, B32B1/02, B32B27/08, B32B27/36, B29C49/00, B29C49/08, B29C49/64 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B29C49/0005 (EP,US);
B29C49/64 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
C08G63/672 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/025 (EP,US);
B29C2049/7879 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/0819 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0829 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0862 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0863 (EP,US);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3008 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3012 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3016 (EP,US);
B29C2949/302 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3026 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3028 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3034 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3041 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3042 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3064 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3092 (EP,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/08 (EP,US);
B29C49/087 (EP);
B29C49/6605 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/258 (EP,US);
B29K2995/004 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0041 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/7242 (US);
B32B2439/60 (US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/025, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L67/025, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L67/025, C08L67/025 (EP,US);
C08L67/025, C08L77/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1998/06] | C08G63/66, C08L67/02, B32B1/02, B32B27/36, B29C49/08, B29C49/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/06] | Title | German: | POLYESTER, POLYESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, POLYESTERLAMINAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIAXIAL GESTRECKTEN FLASCHEN | [1998/06] | English: | POLYESTER, POLYESTER COMPOSITION, POLYESTER LAMINATE, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BIAXIALLY STRETCHED POLYESTER BOTTLES | [1998/06] | French: | POLYESTER, COMPOSITION A BASE DE POLYESTER, STRATIFIE POLYESTER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BOUTEILLES EN POLYESTER ETIREES BI-AXIALEMENT | [1998/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1997 | Translation filed | 03.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 03.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP04004691.4 / EP1433817 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS5736123 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPS608063 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH02172738 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPH05306331 (DONEGANI GUIDO IST); | [X]JPH06298918 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [X]JPH0782389 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [X]JPH0790066 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JPH083430 (KISHIMOTO AKIRA); | [X]JPH0834842 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) |