Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0898548

EP0898548 - MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRANDT, Lennart
Enevägen 15
S-430 33 Fjaras / SE
[1999/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Mossmark, Anders Lennart , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Mossmark, Anders , et al
Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O.Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date97902810.703.02.1997
[1999/09]
WO1997SE00163
Priority number, dateSE1996000179312.05.1996         Original published format: SE 9601793
[1999/09]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9743173
Date:20.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0898548
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997
[1999/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0898548
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE20.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:B63H5/10
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/09]
TitleGerman:VORTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR WASSERFAHRZEUGE[1999/09]
English:MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM[1999/09]
French:APPAREIL PROPULSEUR NAVAL[1999/09]
Entry into regional phase20.11.1997Translation filed 
08.12.1998National basic fee paid 
08.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
22.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2001Fee for grant paid
16.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200004   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH30.05.2001
FI30.05.2001
IT30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
NL30.05.2001
DK30.08.2001
SE30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
GR31.08.2001
GB03.02.2002
[2008/07]
Former [2005/01]CH30.05.2001
FI30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
NL30.05.2001
DK30.08.2001
SE30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
GR31.08.2001
GB03.02.2002
Former [2003/46]CH30.05.2001
FI30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
NL30.05.2001
DK30.08.2001
SE30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
GB03.02.2002
Former [2003/09]CH30.05.2001
FI30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
NL30.05.2001
SE30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
GB03.02.2002
Former [2003/01]CH30.05.2001
FI30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
SE30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
GB03.02.2002
Former [2002/15]CH30.05.2001
FI30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
SE30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE30.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4963108  (KODA MASATOSHI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4604032  (BRANDT LENNART H [SE], et al)