Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0879253

EP0879253 - VINYL AROMATIC BLOCK COPOLYMERS AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.05.2001 [2001/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE CRAENE, Luc, Ives, Jaak
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
02 / DUPONT, Martine, Jeanne
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
03 / GERARD, Eric-Jack
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
04 / DE KEYZER, Noel, Raymond, Maurice
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
05 / MORREN, Karin, Marie-Louise, Renée
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
06 / VAN WESTRENEN, Jeroen
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
[2000/23]
Former [1998/48]01 / DE CRAENE, Luc, Ives, Jaak
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
02 / DUPONT, Martine, Jeanne
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
03 / GERARD, Eric-Jack
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
04 / DE KEYZER, No[l, Raymond, Maurice
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
05 / MORREN, Karin, Marie-Louise, Renée
Avenue Jean-Monnet 1 Louvain-la-Neuve
B-1348 Ottignies / BE
06 / VAN WESTRENEN, Jeroen
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date97903248.907.02.1997
[1998/48]
WO1997EP00587
Priority number, dateEP1996030087109.02.1996         Original published format: EP 96300871
EP1996030527318.07.1996         Original published format: EP 96305273
[1998/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9729140
Date:14.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0879253
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0879253
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08F297/04, C09J153/02
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/48]
TitleGerman:VINYLAROMAT-BLOCKCOPOLYMERE UND DIESELBEN ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[1998/48]
English:VINYL AROMATIC BLOCK COPOLYMERS AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM[1998/48]
French:COPOLYMERES SEQUENCES VINYLIQUES AROMATIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT[1998/48]
Entry into regional phase07.07.1998National basic fee paid 
07.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
28.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2000Fee for grant paid
25.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9513314  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US4096203  (ST CLAIR DAVID J) [A] 1-15;
 [AD]WO9324547  (SHELL CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [AD] 1;
 [AD]EP0314256  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [AD] 1;
 [AD]US5212249  (RICHIE GARY W [US], et al) [AD] 1