Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0888225


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.07.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
22.07.2005 Revocation of patent published on  07.09.2005  [2005/36]
01.07.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
29.06.2005 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
25.06.2005 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
22.06.2005 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2005 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.03.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2005 Appeal number
16.09.2003 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
12.07.2003 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
30.04.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition
28.02.2003 Change - oral proceedings
04.10.2002 Change - oral proceedings
28.09.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
25.07.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
21.03.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
26.02.2001 Examination of admissibility of opposition
16.02.2001 Examination of admissibility of opposition
16.02.2001 Opposition filed published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
15.02.2001 Unpublished change to opponent data
09.02.2001 Opposition filed published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
07.02.2001 Unpublished change to opponent data
24.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]
09.03.2000 Renewal fee
16.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.10.1999 Change - applicant published on  08.12.1999 [1999/49]
22.10.1999 Change - representative published on  08.12.1999 [1999/49]
01.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
01.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.04.1999 First examination report
20.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant
09.12.1998 Renewal fee
20.11.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.01.1999 [1999/01]
20.11.1998 Request for examination filed published on  07.01.1999 [1999/01]
16.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
17.08.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
18.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
20.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication