blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0888225
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0888225Global Dossier 10.05.2000B1
EP0888225 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
EP9700642 12.02.1997
DE29602430 12.02.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59701652D 15.06.2000D1
Priority number Date
EP9700642 12.02.1997
DE59701652 12.02.1997
DE29602430 12.02.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0888225T 07.08.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP9700642 12.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1015325 20.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP9700642 12.02.1997
DE29602430 12.02.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7074477 11.07.2006B2
US2002015828 07.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US12504998 12.08.1998
US90605101 17.07.2001
DE29602430 12.02.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9728974Global Dossier 14.08.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE29602430 12.02.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE29602430U 03.07.1997U1
Priority number Date
DE29602430 12.02.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2146979T 16.08.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE29602430 12.02.1996