blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0888225

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 ITLapse: 12.02.2005
 NL 
Examination procedure05.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase06.08.1998National basic fee paid 
06.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted10.05.2000
Opposition procedure11.07.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 31.08.2005 
Appeal following opposition03.07.2003APPEAL FILED
06.09.2003APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
24.06.2005APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:07.01.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:07.01.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980806
 
Event date:09.06.1999 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19990423
 
Event date:08.12.1999 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:STEINBEIS PPL GMBH
 
Event date:10.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:17.05.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20000510
 
Event date:15.06.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59701652
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000615
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:07.08.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:11.08.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:16.08.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2146979 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:28.03.2001 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:FRANZ BARTA KG
Effective DATE:20010122
 
Event date:04.04.2001 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:FRANZ BARTA KG
Effective DATE:20010122
 
Event date:04.04.2001 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:HEINEKEN TECHNICAL SERVICES B.V.
Effective DATE:20010209
 
Event date:01.05.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:FRANZ BARTA KG
 
Event date:01.06.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:FRANZ BARTA KG
 
Event date:01.06.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:HEINEKEN TECHNICAL SERVICES B.V.
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:23.01.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20040123
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:23.01.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20040123
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:26.01.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20040126
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:27.01.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20040127
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.01.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20040130
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:17.02.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20040217
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:19.02.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20040219
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:12.02.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050212
 
Event date:07.09.2005 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20050711
 
Event date:07.09.2005 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Free Format Text:20050711
 
Event date:01.11.2005 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20050901