Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888225

EP0888225 - TRANSFER LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steinbeis PPL GmbH
Rosenheimer Strasse 51
83098 Brannenburg / DE
[1999/49]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
ZWECKFORM ETIKETTIERTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG
Industriestrasse 2
D-83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / AST, Hans-Peter
St.-Margarethen-Weg 22
D-83098 Brannenburg / DE
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Liska, Horst , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke, F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber, Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm, Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date97903262.012.02.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997EP00642
Priority number, dateDE1996202430U12.02.1996         Original published format: DE 29602430 U
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9728974
Date:14.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0888225
Date:07.01.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888225
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/17, B41M3/12, G09F3/10
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/01]
TitleGerman:TRANSFERETIKETT[1999/01]
English:TRANSFER LABEL[1999/01]
French:ETIQUETTE IMPRIMEE PAR TRANSFERT[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase06.08.1998National basic fee paid 
06.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/01]
23.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.1999Fee for grant paid
05.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2001  12.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Barta KG
Pfeiffergasse 1
1150 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Heinrich, et al
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 02  09.02.2001   
Heineken Technical Services B.V.
2e Weteringsplantsoen 21
1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Adrianus Willem
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2001/14]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2001  12.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Barta KG
Pfeiffergasse 1
1150 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Heinrich, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler Pavlik Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 02  09.02.2001   
Heineken Technical Services B.V.
2e Weteringsplantsoen 21
1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Adrianus Willem
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Former [2001/13]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2001  12.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Barta KG
Pfeiffergasse 1
1150 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Heinrich, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler Pavlik Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
19.02.2001No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
21.02.2001No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
22.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.09.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.01.2003Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.05.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.07.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
11.07.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/36]
Appeal following opposition03.07.2003Appeal received No.  T0765/03
06.09.2003Statement of grounds filed
24.06.2005Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.02.2005
[2007/34]
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9005088  (BRANDT MFG SYST [US]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4529624  (HUBBARD KARL E [US]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9506564  (REXHAM GRAPHICS INC [US]) [A] 1,8,15 * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 30; figure - *;
 [A]US4704310  (TIGHE LAURENCE E [US], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4119416  (JUDEX ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3516842  (KLINKER JOHN J JR, et al)