Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0882074 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0882074



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 750
24.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
08.08.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.08.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
24.07.2007 English translation of the claims Opposition 3
24.07.2007 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
24.07.2007 French translation of claims Opposition 4
14.05.2007 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
14.05.2007 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
14.05.2007 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
07.05.2007 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
25.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Text intended for grant Opposition 16
11.01.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.08.2006 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
05.08.2006 Description Opposition 2
05.08.2006 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
02.08.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
04.07.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 63
21.03.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
07.03.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.02.2006 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
22.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.02.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.02.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2006 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
20.01.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.01.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
17.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
16.12.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.12.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 9
07.12.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 2
10.02.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
04.02.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.10.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
13.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.09.2003 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.09.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
23.06.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 31
29.04.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.04.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.04.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
22.04.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.04.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.02.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.02.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
13.02.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
13.02.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
13.02.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
13.02.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
13.02.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.02.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.02.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 16
10.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.12.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
21.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.2002 Claims Opposition 3
14.11.2002 Claims Opposition 3
14.11.2002 Claims Opposition 3
14.11.2002 Claims Opposition 3
14.11.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.09.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.09.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.09.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.09.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
19.09.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
10.08.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.07.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
13.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.02.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.02.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.02.2001 Claims Opposition 3
06.02.2001 Claims Opposition 3
06.02.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
02.02.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
24.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.11.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.08.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.08.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
03.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.03.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
28.02.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.02.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
26.08.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.05.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.05.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.05.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.04.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
30.03.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
05.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
09.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.01.1999 Description Search / examination 8
18.01.1999 Description Search / examination 8
18.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.10.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.08.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.1998 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.1998 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.07.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.07.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.07.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.07.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.07.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.07.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.06.1998 Annex Search / examination 7
22.06.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.05.1998 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
08.05.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
29.09.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.08.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
28.08.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28
28.08.1997 Priority document Search / examination 28
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 22
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 30
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
19.02.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12