Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0827337

EP0827337 - WEARABLE INFORMATION DISPLAYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/10]WEARABLE INFORMATION DISPLAYING DEVICE AND INFORMATION DISPLAYING METHOD USING THE SAME
[2005/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-08 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAMAKURA, Hiroshi-Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome,Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
02 / ONO, Hiroshi-Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome,Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Kerry John , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]Tomlinson, Kerry John , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date97903618.326.02.1997
[1998/10]
WO1997JP00576
Priority number, dateJP1996003845726.02.1996         Original published format: JP 3845796
[1998/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9731477
Date:28.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0827337
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997
[1998/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0827337
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/64
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/10]
TitleGerman:TRAGBARES INFORMATIONSANZEIGEGERÄT[2005/38]
English:WEARABLE INFORMATION DISPLAYING DEVICE[2005/38]
French:DISPOSITIF PORTABLE AFFICHANT DES INFORMATIONS[2005/38]
Former [1998/10]TRAGBARES INFORMATIONSANZEIGEGERÄT UND -VERFAHREN UNTER DESSEN VERWENDUNG
Former [1998/10]WEARABLE INFORMATION DISPLAYING DEVICE AND INFORMATION DISPLAYING METHOD USING THE SAME
Former [1998/10]DISPOSITIF PORTABLE AFFICHANT DES INFORMATIONS ET PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS UTILISANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF
Entry into regional phase21.11.1997Translation filed 
21.11.1997National basic fee paid 
21.11.1997Search fee paid 
21.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/14]
12.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2006Fee for grant paid
15.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Request for further processing for:10.02.2003Request for further processing filed
10.02.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.02.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO8802494  (INSIGHT) [X] 1,2,24 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 18 * * page 11, line 5 - page 12, line 29 * * page 14, line 7 - line 29 * [A] 3-5,9,14;
 [A]WO9511473  (KOPIN) [A] 1-4,7,9-12,14,17,24 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 15 * * page 4, line 4 - line 12 * * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 21 * * page 34, line 18 - page 40, line 4 * * page 45, line 33 - page 47, line 12 * * figures 47,51,56,57 * * figures 59,60 *;
 [PA]EP0716329  (SEIKO EPSON) [PA] 1-4,24 * page 3, line 3 - line 10 * * page 22, line 1 - line 51 *;
 [A]WO9600406  (SEIKO EPSON) [A] 1-4,24;
 [A]EP0539907  (SEGA ENTERPRISES) [A] 1,2,5 * column 8, line 37 - column 11, line 10 *;
 [A]US5305244  (NEWMAN ET AL.) [A] 1,6,7,9,14,18,24,25,28 * figures 1,5 * * column 4, line 61 - column 6, line 17 * * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 60 *;
 [A]WO9507526  (CRITICOM) [A] 1,9-14,24,26,27 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 26 * * page 5, line 6 - page 11, line 21 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 21 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 30 *;
 [A]JPH07311857  (FUJITSU) [A] 1,9-11,13,24,26,27 * the whole document *;
 US5796991  [ ] (SHIMIZU) [ ] * column 1, line 41 - line 45 * * column 2, line 20 - line 33 * * column 3, line 50 - line 67 * * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 28 * * column 15, line 41 - line 45 *;
 [PA]US5579026  (TABATA) [PA] 1,9-11,13,23,24,26,27 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 18 * * column 11, line 59 - column 13, line 34; figure 1 *;
 JPH06326944  [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL);
 JPH07298165  [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL);
 [A]JPH05241540  ;
 [A]EP0531645  (PSC) [A] 1,9,14,18-20,24,28,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0679984  (CANON) [A] 1,14-16,19,23-26,28 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 7 * * column 16, line 16 - line 28 * * column 4, line 3 - line 32 *;
 [A]WO9206392  (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY) [A] 17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931224), vol. 17, no. 707, Database accession no. (P - 1667), & JP05241540 A 19930921 (FUJITA) [A] 1,9-11,24,26,27 * abstract *
 [A]  - MEYER ET AL., "A Survey of Position Trackers", PRESENCE, MIT Press, USA, (1992), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 173 - 200, XP002103552 [A] 1,15,16 * page 175, column L, paragraph L - column R, line 2 *
International search[Y]JPH0792426  ;
 [Y]JPH06268943  ;
 [Y]JPH06289318  ;
 [Y]JPH0670267  ;
 [Y]JPH06326944