Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0836870

EP0836870 - GAME DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD.
2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD.
2-12 Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAKE, Junji
Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Shinji
Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144 / JP
03 / MATSUNAGA, Tomohiro
Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144 / JP
04 / SUZUKI, Hiroyasu
Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144 / JP
05 / YANASE, Masahito
Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144 / JP
06 / MIZUNO, Shigetoshi
Sega Enterprises, Ltd., 2-12, Haneda 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144 / JP
[1998/17]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H.
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys.
PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date97903659.704.03.1997
[1998/17]
WO1997JP00660
Priority number, dateJP1996007541606.03.1996         Original published format: JP 7541696
JP1996030534815.11.1996         Original published format: JP 30534896
[1998/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9732640
Date:12.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0836870
Date:22.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997
[1998/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0836870
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:A63F7/06
[1998/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/17]
TitleGerman:SPIELVORRICHTUNG[1998/17]
English:GAME DEVICE[1998/17]
French:APPAREIL DE JEU[1998/17]
Entry into regional phase06.11.1997Translation filed 
06.11.1997National basic fee paid 
06.11.1997Search fee paid 
06.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/17]
06.11.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
16.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
16.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2003Fee for grant paid
17.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE26.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
[2004/23]
Former [2004/13]ES22.12.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US4173341  (OLLIGES WILLIAM E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4173338  (BARNETT ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-4,6-8,10 * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 23; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US3927885  (CROSSMAN P E, et al) [A] 1,9,10 * column 3, line 26 - column 6, line 20; figures 1,2,13 *;
 [A]US4032150  (WILSON DAVID C) [A] 1,5,10 * column 2, line 12 - column 2, line 26; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US5364096  (CEBULA EDWIN [US], et al) [A] 1 * see abstract;; figures 1,2 *
International search[A]JPS6382682  (NAMUKO KK);
 [AP]JPH08299584  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK)
ExaminationUS3066937