Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009964

EP1009964 - HEAT REGENERATION FOR OXY-FUEL FIRED FURNACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Frazier-Simplex Inc.
436 East Beau Street
Washington, PA 15301-0493 / US
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / ARGENT, Ronald, D.
P.O. Box 140
Graysville, PA 15337 / US
02 / HOYLE, Christopher, J.
120 Holly Drive
Houston, PA 15342 / US
03 / DICKINSON, Gordon
610-B Thomas Road
Eighty-Four, PA 15330 / US
04 / WARD, Trevor
River Bank, 3 Saw Mill Lane
Helmsley, North Yorkshire Y06 5DQ / GB
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Howden, Christopher A.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Howden, Christopher Andrew
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date97903923.724.01.1997
[2000/25]
WO1997US01053
Priority number, dateUS19960010579P25.01.1996         Original published format: US 10579 P
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9727441
Date:31.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009964
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.07.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:F27D17/00, C03B5/237
[2003/04]
Former International [2000/25]F27D17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:WÄRMERÜCKFÜHRUNG FÜR SAUERSTOFF-BRENNSTOFF BEFEUERTE ÖFEN[2000/25]
English:HEAT REGENERATION FOR OXY-FUEL FIRED FURNACES[2000/25]
French:REGENERATION DE CHALEUR POUR FOURS CHAUFFES A L'OXYGENE ET AU GAZ COMBUSTIBLE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase30.07.1998National basic fee paid 
30.07.1998Search fee paid 
30.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.07.1998Examination requested  [2000/25]
13.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5401165  (SMITH DANIEL P [US]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3633886  (FROBERG MAGNUS L) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 22 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4874311  (GITMAN GREGORY M [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 12 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4604051  (DAVIES THEODORE E [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 29 * * figures 1,10 *;
 [A]US4676744  (WRAY GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5098286  (YORK JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE3503103  (OWENS ILLINOIS INC [US]) [DA] 1-25 * page 28, line 5 - page 32, line 22 * * figure 6 *
International search[Y]US5401165  (SMITH DANIEL P [US]);
 [Y]US3633886  (FROBERG MAGNUS L);
 [Y]US4874311  (GITMAN GREGORY M [US]);
 [A]US4604051  (DAVIES THEODORE E [US], et al);
 [A]US4676744  (WRAY GEORGE [GB], et al);
 [A]US5098286  (YORK JAMES A [US])