Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0876717

EP0876717 - TIME-DUPLEX WIRELESS TELEPHONE WITH IMPROVED HEARING-AID COMPATIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DENT, Paul
637 Eaglepoint Road
Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US
[1998/46]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
D-81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97903956.724.01.1997
[1998/46]
WO1997US01147
Priority number, dateUS1996059106125.01.1996         Original published format: US 591061
[1998/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9727682
Date:31.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0876717
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997
[1998/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0876717
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04B15/00
[1998/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1998/46]
TitleGerman:SCHNURLOSES ZEITDUPLEXTELEFON MIT VERBESSERTER HÖRGERÄTEKOMPATIBILITÄT[1998/46]
English:TIME-DUPLEX WIRELESS TELEPHONE WITH IMPROVED HEARING-AID COMPATIBILITY[1998/46]
French:TELEPHONE SANS FIL DUPLEXE DANS LE TEMPS PRESENTANT UNE COMPATIBILITE AMELIOREE AVEC LES APPAREILS AUDITIFS[1998/46]
Entry into regional phase13.08.1998National basic fee paid 
13.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
24.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.1999Fee for grant paid
22.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0405783  (FERRANTI CREDITPHONE [GB]) [A] 1,14,25 * the whole document *;
 [AP]JPH08162995  ;
 [A]US2989705  (ROMANO SAM S, et al) [A] 1,14,25 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 10 *
 [AP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, [AP] 1,14,25 * abstract *