Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0879028

EP0879028 - VASCULAR PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/48]VASCULAR PROSTHESIS ASSEMBLY
[1998/52]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.10.2000 [2000/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Havel, Michael
Linzerstrasse 54
1140 Wien / AT
For all designated states
Ehrlich, Marek
Rochusgasse 9/11
1030 Wien / AT
[1998/48]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Haffner, Thomas M.
Haffner und Keschmann
Patentanwälte KG
Schottengasse 3a
1014 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Haffner, Thomas M., Dr.
Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a
1014 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date97904286.806.02.1997
[1998/48]
WO1997AT00022
Priority number, dateAT1996000021806.02.1996         Original published format: AT 21896
[1998/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9728758
Date:14.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0879028
Date:25.11.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0879028
Date:27.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/48]
TitleGerman:GEFÄSSPROTHESE[1998/48]
English:VASCULAR PROSTHESIS[1998/52]
French:PROTHESE VASCULAIRE[1998/52]
Former [1998/48]VASCULAR PROSTHESIS ASSEMBLY
Former [1998/48]ENSEMBLE PROTHESE VASCULAIRE
Entry into regional phase26.08.1998National basic fee paid 
26.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
05.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.1999Fee for grant paid
18.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199903   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.1999
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5415664  (PINCHUK) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 4 - line 48; figure 5 *;
 [Y]EP0472731  (INOUE) [Y] 1 * column 8, line 7 - line 56; figures 7-11 *;
 [A]US5078720  (AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 5 - line 41; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0364420  (MEDINVENT) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0539237  (COOK INCORPORATED)