Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0934984

EP0934984 - CURABLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.10.2002  [2002/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / CHIBA, Makoto
6-512, Maikodai 6-chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655 / JP
02 / OKAMOTO, Toshihiko
31-17, Shioyacho 6-chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655 / JP
03 / SAKAGUCHI, Masashi
109, Mizonokuchi 2-chome, Kakogawacho
Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675 / JP
04 / TAKASE, Junji
5-20, Nishiakashicho 5-chome
Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673 / JP
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date97904598.621.02.1997
[1999/32]
WO1997JP00485
Priority number, dateJP1996003393121.02.1996         Original published format: JP 3393196
[1999/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9731066
Date:28.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934984
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997
[1999/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08L101/10, C08L23/26, C08K5/54, C08K5/36, C08K5/39
[1999/32]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [1999/32]
TitleGerman:HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1999/32]
English:CURABLE COMPOSITION[1999/32]
French:COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE[1999/32]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1998Translation filed 
17.09.1998National basic fee paid 
17.09.1998Search fee paid 
17.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
21.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/32]
19.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/43]
21.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0312967  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [XD] 1-5 * page 6, line 43 - page 9, line 26 * * page 10, line 3 - line 5 * * page 10, line 17 - line 28 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [X]EP0287025  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 35 * * page 4, line 45 * * page 5, line 27 - page 10, line 20 * * page 10, line 41 - line 43 * * claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]EP0034722  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 7 - line 19 * * page 7, line 10 - line 11 * * tables 1,3 * * claims 1,5,7 *;
 JPS63193953  [ ] (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD);
 [A]US4180514  (DOSS RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]GB1163875  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *
 [Y]  MURATA, TSUTOMU ET AL, "Weather-resistant curable compositions", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 110:24923, URL: STN, XP002120375 [Y] 1 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPS636041  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [Y]JPS6268831  (CHEMIPRO KASEI KAISHA LTD);
 [Y]JPS5948496  (BORG WARNER CHEMICALS INC)