Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0834555

EP0834555 - NOVEL CELLULOSE-PRODUCING BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
[2006/35]
Former [2002/35]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Former [1998/15]For all designated states
BIO-POLYMER RESEARCH CO., LTD.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TSUCHIDA, Takayasu Bio Polymer Research Co., Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213 / JP
02 / TONOUCHI, Naoto Bio Polymer Research Co., Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213 / JP
03 / SETO, Akira Bio Polymer Research Co., Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213 / JP
04 / KOJIMA, Yukiko Bio Polymer Research Co., Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213 / JP
05 / MATSUOKA, Masanobu Bio Polymer Research Co., Ltd.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213 / JP
06 / YOSHINAGA, Fumihiro Bio Polymer Research Co.
Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213 / JP
[1998/15]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/15]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date97904620.824.02.1997
[1998/15]
WO1997JP00514
Priority number, dateJP1996012395123.04.1996         Original published format: JP 12395196
JP1996014976322.05.1996         Original published format: JP 14976396
JP1996017439314.06.1996         Original published format: JP 17439396
[1998/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9740135
Date:30.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0834555
Date:08.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0834555
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.10.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/20, C08B37/00, C12P19/04, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:02),(C12P19/04, C12R1:02)
[1998/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/15]
TitleGerman:NEUE ZELLULOSE PRODUZIERENDE BAKTERIEN[1998/15]
English:NOVEL CELLULOSE-PRODUCING BACTERIA[1998/15]
French:NOUVELLES BACTERIES PRODUISANT DE LA CELLULOSE[1998/15]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase16.01.1998Translation filed 
16.01.1998National basic fee paid 
16.01.1998Search fee paid 
16.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
10.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2006Fee for grant paid
07.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH07313181  ;
 [A]JPH07327669  ;
 [TD]JPH09131183
 [DA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 06, Database accession no. 1996-053798, XP002128531 & JPH07313181 A 19951205 (BIOPOLYMER RES KK) [DA] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 08, Database accession no. 1996-072328, XP002128532 & JPH07327669 A 19951219 (BIOPOLYMER RES KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - TAKEMURA H ET AL, "Prosthetic group of aldehyde dehydrogenase in acetic acid bacteria not pyrroloquinoline quinone", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY., JAPAN SOC. FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND AGROCHEM. TOKYO, JP, (1994), vol. 58, no. 11, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 2082 - 2083, XP002128530 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [TD]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 30, Database accession no. 1997-327274, XP002128533 & JPH09131183 A 19970520 (BIOPOLYMER RES KK) [TD] 17 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH08260  (BIO POLYMER RES KK);
 [A]JPS62175190  (CETUS CORP)