EP0822743 - A CONSTRUCTION INCLUDING A SHED FOR ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Opposition rejected | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [1998/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER LELY, Cornelis 7 Brüschenrain CH-6300 Zug / CH | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
Former [1998/07] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 97904658.8 | 21.02.1997 | [1998/07] | WO1997NL00082 | Priority number, date | NL19961002487 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: NL 1002487 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731524 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822743 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822743 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01, A01K5/02 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
A01K1/01 (EP,US);
A01K5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1998/07] | Title | German: | EINE EINEN TIERSTALL ENTHALTENDE KONSTRUKTION | [1998/07] | English: | A CONSTRUCTION INCLUDING A SHED FOR ANIMALS | [1998/07] | French: | CONSTRUCTION COMPRENANT UNE ETABLE POUR ANIMAUX | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.02.2001
ADMISSIBLE Prolion B.V. Kromme Spieringweg 248B 2140 AA Vijfhuizen / NL Opponent's representative Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.02.2001
ADMISSIBLE Prolion B.V. Kromme Spieringweg 248B 2140 AA Vijfhuizen / NL Opponent's representative Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf (NL) P.O. Box 3 2050 AA Overveen / NL | 05.04.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.08.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.07.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.08.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/01] | Request for further processing for: | 28.01.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]NL301249 (MEUWISSEN); | [A]NL8006788 (INT PROJECT AGENCY B V) [A] 2-4 * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 22; figures 4,6 *; | [A]FR2586405 (HIRET ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1,5 * claim 1 *; | [A]NL8703037 (TYH YUAN HOUR); | [A]FR2632518 (MERLANDE JEAN HENRI [FR]); | [A]EP0400304 (HEIDE HANS VON DER [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,7,10,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3932034 (AUSTERMUEHLE JOERG WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,10,17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9104656 (KANGAS JARMO MATTI [FI]); | [A]GB2238564 (SHREEVE LESLIE JAMES); | [XA]EP0473051 (IRPS HARTWIG [DE]) [X] 1,30 * column 3, lines 19-35; figure 1 * [A] 3,31 |