Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0906042

EP0906042 - ADVERTISING TABLE WITH REPLACEABLE INSERT FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hayman-Chaffey, Charles
138 East 26th Street
New York, NY 10010 / US
[1999/14]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/14]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/14]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date97904871.728.01.1997
[1999/14]
WO1997US01215
Priority number, dateUS19960013301P08.03.1996         Original published format: US 13301 P
[1999/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9732503
Date:12.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0906042
Date:07.04.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997
[1999/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0906042
Date:12.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47B17/00, A47B13/08
[2000/30]
Former International [1999/14]A47B17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/14]
TitleGerman:WERBETISCH MIT AUSWECHSELBARER EINSATZVORRICHTUNG[1999/14]
English:ADVERTISING TABLE WITH REPLACEABLE INSERT FEATURE[1999/14]
French:TABLE PUBLICITAIRE A PANNEAU RAPPORTE REMPLACABLE[2002/24]
Former [1999/14]TABLE PUBLICITAIRE A PANNEAU RAPPORTE REMPLA ABLE
Entry into regional phase07.10.1998National basic fee paid 
07.10.1998Search fee paid 
07.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/14]
20.02.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
29.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2002Fee for grant paid
20.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.06.2002
BE12.06.2002
FI12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
IE28.01.2003
LU28.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/40]AT12.06.2002
BE12.06.2002
FI12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
IE28.01.2003
LU28.01.2003
Former [2004/39]AT12.06.2002
BE12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
IE28.01.2003
LU28.01.2003
Former [2004/15]AT12.06.2002
BE12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
IE28.01.2003
Former [2003/48]AT12.06.2002
BE12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2003/46]AT12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2003/21]AT12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2003/20]AT12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
Former [2003/10]AT12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
Former [2003/09]NL12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
Former [2002/49]SE12.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]US1825464  (PETER LOPEZ) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0403167  (ARENSON INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0572025  (HON IND INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2276649  (HAUSBERG JOCELYN [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US1850420  (SCHULDT SOPHIE J);
 [A]US2903312  (LAWLESS CLEMENT J);
 [A]US3554140  (HOMESBERGER JOSEPH L);
 [A]US4484745  (SLEEPER JOHN R [US]);
 [A]US5436048  (MEIER MAX [DE], et al);
 [A]US5496609  (MICHELSTEIN SUSAN L [US]);
 [XP]US5497597  (ELZENBECK MANFRED [DE])
by applicantUS5480698
 US4293603