Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976030

EP0976030 - INSTRUCTION FOLDING FOR A STACK-BASED MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.05.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road, M/S Palo 1-521
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
[2008/27]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road, MS PAL01-521
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / O'CONNOR, James, Michael
345 Ruth Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / TREMBLAY, Marc
Apartment 3, 801 Waverly Street
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2000/05]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date97904872.523.01.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US01221
Priority number, dateUS19960010527P24.01.1996         Original published format: US 10527 P
US1996064398407.05.1996         Original published format: US 643984
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9727536
Date:31.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976030
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976030
Date:02.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/318
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:BEFEHLSFALTEN IN EINEM STAPELSPEICHERPROZESSOR[2000/05]
English:INSTRUCTION FOLDING FOR A STACK-BASED MACHINE[2000/05]
French:PLIAGE D'INSTRUCTIONS POUR MACHINE A EMPILEMENT[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase14.07.1998National basic fee paid 
14.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.1998Examination requested  [2000/05]
21.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2008Fee for grant paid
29.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199903   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL02.07.2008
SE02.10.2008
FR02.02.2009
[2010/28]
Former [2010/19]NL02.07.2008
SE02.10.2008
Former [2009/01]NL02.07.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9427214  (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [A] 1,19,29,30 * see page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 16 ; page 6, lines 5-17 ; page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 20 *;
 [A]EP0011442  (PANAFACOM LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,19,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0071028  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,19,29,30 * see page 4, lines 7-29 ; page 9, lines 1-21 *;
 [A]US5187793  (KEITH JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 18,28 * the whole document *