Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970502

EP0970502 - OPTICAL SHUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.10.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3DV Systems Ltd.
P.O. Box 249
Yokneam Elit 20692 / IL
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / YAHAV, Giora
Belliss Street 11
34814 Haifa / IL
02 / IDDAN, Gavriel, J.
Einstein Street 44A
34602 Haifa / IL
[2000/02]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2000/02]de Bruijn, Leendert C.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date97905378.207.03.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997IL00084
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839790
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970502
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01J31/50
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER VERSCHLUSS[2000/02]
English:OPTICAL SHUTTER[2000/02]
French:OBTURATEUR OPTIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
04.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/51]
15.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US4220975  (LIEBER ALBERT J ET AL) [A] 1,8 * claims 1-14 *;
 [A]US3474275  (STOUDENHEIMER RICHARD G ET AL) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US2946895  (R.G.STOUDENHEIMER ET AL.) [A] 1,8 * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]GB2082830  (HAMAMATSU TV CO LTD) [A] 8 * page 4, line 60 - page 7, line 13; figure 4 *;
 [A]US3317771  (P.D.WILLIAMS)