Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0824167

EP0824167 - METHOD OF REPAIRING AND REINFORCING PRESTRESSED CONCRETE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corporation Hork
Sanko Building 3F, 33-5, Nasuzukuri 3-chome Hirakata-shi
Osaka 573 / JP
For all designated states
Prestressed Concrete Constructors Association
4-6, Tsukudo-cho Shinjyuku-ku
Tokyo 162 / JP
For all designated states
Tonen Corporation
1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/08]For all designated states
Corporation Hork
Sanko Building 3F, 33-5, Nasuzukuri 3-chome
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
For all designated states
Prestressed Concrete Constructors Association
4-6, Tsukudo-cho
Shinjyuku-ku, Tokyo 162 / JP
For all designated states
Tonen Corporation
1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Shinzo Corporation Hork
33-5, Nasuzukuri 3-chome Hirakata-shi
Osaka 573 / JP
02 / OZAWA, Tsuneo P.S Corporation
8-30, Tenmabashi 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530 / JP
03 / UEMURA, Masahiko Tonen Corporation
1-1, Hitotsubashi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[1998/08]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/08]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date97905420.227.02.1997
[1998/08]
WO1997JP00599
Priority number, dateJP1996004390429.02.1996         Original published format: JP 4390496
[1998/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9732084
Date:04.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0824167
Date:18.02.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997
[1998/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:E01D21/00, E01D22/00
[2000/29]
Former International [1998/08]E01D21/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UM VORGESPANNTE BETONSTRUKTUREN ZU REPARIEREN UND BEWEHREN[1998/08]
English:METHOD OF REPAIRING AND REINFORCING PRESTRESSED CONCRETE STRUCTURE[1998/08]
French:PROCEDE DE REPARATION ET DE RENFORT DE STRUCTURES EN BETON PRECONTRAINT[1998/08]
Entry into regional phase28.10.1997Translation filed 
11.11.1997National basic fee paid 
11.11.1997Search fee paid 
11.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
30.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/12]
29.09.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1256671  (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0378232  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,7,8,10,11 * the whole document *
International search[A]JPS60238504  (NITSUKAI GIKEN KK);
 [A]JPH0480161B