Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016501

EP1016501 - STAPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nagai Works Co., Ltd.
6-8-6, Izumi-cho, Hoya-Shi
Tokyo 202-0011 / JP
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGAI, Mikio
6-8-6, Izumi-cho
Hoya-shi Tokyo 202 / JP
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner
Operngasse 4
P.O. Box 96
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Patentanwälte BARGER, PISO & PARTNER
Mahlerstrasse 9 Postfach 96
1015 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date97905464.007.03.1997
[2000/27]
WO1997JP00720
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839143
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016501
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:B25C5/02
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/27]
TitleGerman:HEFTER[2000/27]
English:STAPLER[2000/27]
French:AGRAFEUSE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999Translation filed 
07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Search fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
01.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/17]
10.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS60194483U  ;
 [A]JPS6192575U