Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990697

EP0990697 - GRANULAR DETERGENT COMPOSITION FOR CLOTHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.04.2010
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 26.05.2010  [2010/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KAO CORPORATION
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome
Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP
[2010/21]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome
Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAGUCHI, Shu, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640 / JP
02 / TAMURA, Shigeru, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640 / JP
03 / TERANISHI, Futoshi, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640 / JP
04 / USHIO, Noriaki, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.ator
1334, Minato
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640 / JP
05 / TSUMADORI, Masaki, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640 / JP
06 / YAMASHITA, Hiroyuki, Kao Corp., Research Lab.h
1334, Minato
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640 / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97905475.610.03.1997
[2000/14]
WO1997JP00749
Priority number, dateJP1996008323811.03.1996         Original published format: JP 8323896
[2000/14]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9733968
Date:18.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990697
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990697
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0990697
Date:26.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/21]
Search report(s)International search reportJP18.09.1997
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/06, C11D10/02, C11D3/08, C11D3/37, C11D3/02, C11D3/20
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/14]
TitleGerman:GRANULARES WASCHMITTEL FÜR KLEIDUNG[2000/14]
English:GRANULAR DETERGENT COMPOSITION FOR CLOTHING[2000/14]
French:COMPOSITION DETERGENTE GRANULAIRE POUR VETEMENTS[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1998Translation filed 
08.09.1998National basic fee paid 
08.09.1998Search fee paid 
08.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.09.1998Examination requested  [2000/14]
22.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2003Fee for grant paid
06.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.04.2004   
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Bristow, Stephen Robert
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  07.04.2004   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2009/50]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2004   
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Bristow, Stephen Robert
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  07.04.2004   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2007/17]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2004   
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Bristow, Stephen Robert
Unilever PLC Intellectual Property Group Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  07.04.2004   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2005/14]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2004   
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Bristow, Stephen Robert
Unilever PLC Intellectual Property Group Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  07.04.2004   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2004/24]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2004   
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Bowman, Paul Alan
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
 02  07.04.2004   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2004/23]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2004   
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Bowman, Paul Alan
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
25.05.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.12.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
07.06.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.06.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2009Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
16.07.2009Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.09.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.09.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.01.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.04.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition08.08.2006Appeal received No.  T1239/06
18.10.2006Statement of grounds filed
30.07.2008Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
30.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
07.08.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9218594  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4 *;
 [D]JPH06507197
International search[X]JPH06500141  ;
 [X]JPH06502199  ;
 [Y]JPH0711292  (KAO CORP)
OppositionWO9504125
 EP0534525
 WO9203525
 US5378388
 US5393455
 WO9218594
 WO9500622
 WO9403554
 WO9206151