blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0876586

EP0876586 - QUADRANT LIGHT DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.04.2002  [2002/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Optical Technologies, LLC
8301 Greensboro Drive, Suite 160
McLean, VA 22102 / US
[1999/38]
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
10260 Campus Point Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAMER, David, P.
666 Carlisle Avenue
Dayton, OH 45410 / US
02 / RAINS, Jack, C., Jr.
2946 Timber Wood Way
Herndon, VA 22071 / US
[1998/46]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]Read, Matthew Charles, et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date97905575.322.01.1997
[1998/46]
WO1997US00555
Priority number, dateUS1996058910423.01.1996         Original published format: US 589104
[1998/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9744638
Date:27.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0876586
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01C21/00
[1998/46]
CPC:
G01S17/42 (EP,US); G01S3/7835 (EP,US); G01S5/16 (EP,US);
G01S5/163 (EP,US); G01S7/4816 (EP,US); G01S17/66 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/46]
TitleGerman:QUADRANTENLICHTDETEKTOR[1998/46]
English:QUADRANT LIGHT DETECTOR[1998/46]
French:PHOTODETECTEUR QUATRE QUADRANTS[1998/46]
Entry into regional phase17.07.1998National basic fee paid 
17.07.1998Search fee paid 
17.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
21.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
08.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/17]
18.11.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3838277  (MORGENSTERN B, et al) [A] 1,4,10 * column A; figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 28 *
International search[A]US2969018  (ERST STEPHEN J, et al);
 [A]US3777160  (BERNT P);
 [A]US4711998  (MALEK FRITZ J [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.