Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0954372

EP0954372 - GAS AND LIQUID MIXING APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomixer Corporation
12600 Yukon Avenue
Hawthorne, CA 91403 / US
[1999/45]
Inventor(s)01 / BAILEY, Wayne, A.
2450 Hermosa
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254 / US
[1999/45]
Representative(s)Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [1999/45]Pluckrose, Anthony William , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97905643.901.02.1997
[1999/45]
WO1997US01366
Priority number, dateUS1996056545501.02.1996         Original published format: US 565455
[1999/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9727937
Date:07.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0954372
Date:10.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997
[1999/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01F3/04
[1999/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN VON GASEN MIT FLÜSSIGKEITEN[1999/45]
English:GAS AND LIQUID MIXING APPARATUS AND METHODS[1999/45]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDES DE MELANGE DE GAZ ET DE LIQUIDE[1999/45]
Entry into regional phase28.08.1998National basic fee paid 
28.08.1998Search fee paid 
28.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/45]
22.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/12]
22.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/12]
Divisional application(s)EP03002911.0  / EP1319434
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US4371480  (VOS GEERT H [NL]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 26-33; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US5045470  (KLOSS GERD [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 16; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE1089368  (KUEHNLE KOPP KAUSCH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 21-29; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]GB1449410  (JA RO AB OY) [A] 1,2 * page 1, column R, lines 79,80 * * page 2, column R, lines 12-125 *;
 [A]US2121458  (WILHELM VOGELBUSEH) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, lines 64-71 *
International search[A]US2138349  (MALLORY EDWARD B);
 [A]US1124855  (CALLOW JOHN M [US], et al);
 [A]US3630498  (BIELINSKI GEORGE D);
 [A]US915372  (NEILL WILLIAM A [US]);
 [A]GB955879  (PROPRIETORS OF HAY S WHARF LTD);
 [A]DE2023981  (SCHNYDER H);
 [A]US3677528  (MARTIN GODFREY Q)