Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888211

EP0888211 - HIGHLY POROUS POLYVINYLIDENE DIFLUORIDE MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PALL CORPORATION
2200 Northern Blvd.
East Hills, New York 11548 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Pall Corporation
2200 Northern Blvd.
East Hills, New York 11548 / US
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
USF Filtration and Separations Group Inc.
2118 Greensprings Drive
Timonium, Maryland 21093 / US
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
USF Filtration and Separations Group Inc.
9690 Deereco Road Suite 700
Timonium, Maryland 21093 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, I-Fan
12037 Mil Pitrero Road
San Diego, California 92128 / US
02 / DITTER, Jerome, F.
10655 Equestrian Drive
Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US
03 / ZEPF, Robert
227 North Rios Avenue
Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US
[1999/12]
Former [1999/01]01 / WANG, I-Fan
13248 Sparren Avenue
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
02 / DITTER, Jerome, F.
10655 Equestrian Drive
Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US
03 / ZEPF, Robert
227 North Rios Avenue
Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US
Representative(s)Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/42]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [1999/12]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Former [1999/01]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date97905674.422.01.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997US01496
Priority number, dateUS19960010294P22.01.1996         Original published format: US 10294 P
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9726134
Date:24.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0888211
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888211
Date:03.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.07.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B32B5/14, B01D39/14, B05D5/00, B01D71/34, B01D67/00
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/01]B32B5/14, B01D39/14, B05D5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/01]
TitleGerman:HOCHPORÖSE MEMBRAN AUS POLYVINYLIDENDIFLUORID[1999/01]
English:HIGHLY POROUS POLYVINYLIDENE DIFLUORIDE MEMBRANES[1999/01]
French:MEMBRANES DE DIFLUORURE DE POLYVINYLIDENE HAUTEMENT POREUSES[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase30.07.1998National basic fee paid 
30.07.1998Search fee paid 
30.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.07.1998Examination requested  [1999/01]
12.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2004Fee for grant paid
02.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04076791.5  / EP1464477
Opposition(s)04.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.11.2004
BE03.11.2004
CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
LU22.01.2005
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
PT03.04.2005
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]AT03.11.2004
BE03.11.2004
CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
LU22.01.2005
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
Former [2006/24]AT03.11.2004
BE03.11.2004
CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
IE24.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
Former [2006/14]AT03.11.2004
BE03.11.2004
CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
MC31.01.2005
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
Former [2005/51]AT03.11.2004
BE03.11.2004
CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT03.11.2004
CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT03.11.2004
CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
GR03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
Former [2005/27]CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
GR03.02.2005
ES14.02.2005
Former [2005/26]CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/25]CH03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
LI03.11.2004
Former [2005/24]FI03.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0037836  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 * * page 4, line 19 - line 28 * * page 24, line 18 - page 25, line 11 * * page 40, line 29 - page 41, line 3 *;
 [A]JPH06296836
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06296836 A 19941025 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 02, Database accession no. 1995-010973 [ ] * abstract *
International search[X]US4933081
 [X]US4629563
 [A]US4203848