Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998388

EP0998388 - POUCHES FOR PACKAGING FLOWABLE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2008
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street, 1790 Building
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FALLA, Daniel, James
2105 Blackwell Road
Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7K7 / CA
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Dey, Michael , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Dey, Michael , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2007/24]Dey, Michael , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
Former [2001/41]Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/19]Weickmann, Heinrich , et al
Weickmann-Fincke-Huber-Liska-Prechtel, Postfach 860820, Kopernikusstr. 9
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date97905720.511.02.1997
[2000/19]
WO1997US01671
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9834844
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998388
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998388
Date:04.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/14]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0998388
Date:03.10.2007
[N/P]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32, C08J5/18, C08L23/08, C08L23/04, C08L23/06
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/19]
TitleGerman:BEUTEL ZUM VERPACKEN FLIESSFÄHIGER MATERIALIEN[2000/19]
English:POUCHES FOR PACKAGING FLOWABLE MATERIALS[2000/19]
French:SACHETS DESTINES A EMBALLER DES MATIERES FLUIDES[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase13.09.1999National basic fee paid 
13.09.1999Search fee paid 
13.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
10.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2007Fee for grant paid
12.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
09.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
05.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.04.2007
FI04.04.2007
LI04.04.2007
SE04.07.2007
[2008/07]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9500587  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * page 8, lines 9-27 * * page 9, lines 5-10,24 * * page 10, lines 14,15,17-25 * * page 11, lines 19-28 * * page 12, lines 13-15 * * page 20, line 15 *;
 [A]US5344884  (BENHAM ELIZABETH A [US], et al) [A] 1,20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 42-65 * * column 3, lines 47-68 * * column 4, lines 15-68 * * column 5, lines 44-48 *
International search[X]US4521437  (STORMS WILLIAM J [CA]);
 [X]US5288531  (FALLA DANIEL J [CA], et al)
by applicantUS4503102
 US4521437
 US5288531
    - WILLIAMS AND WARD, JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, (1968), vol. 6, page 621,
    - MODERN PLASTICS MID-OCTOBER 1989 ENCYCLOPEDIA ISSUE, (198910), vol. 66, no. 11, pages 264 - 266,
    - MODERN PLASTICS MID-OCTOBER 1989 ENCYCLOPEDIA ISSUE, (198910), vol. 66, no. 11, pages 256 - 257,