Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0880861

EP0880861 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING AVAILABLE FREQUENCIES IN SELECTIVE CALL RECEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2017  [2017/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google Technology Holdings LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2016/21]
Former [2012/35]For all designated states
Motorola Mobility LLC
600 North US Highway 45
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
Former [2011/09]For all designated states
Motorola Mobility, Inc.
600 North US Highway 45
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
Former [1998/49]For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AYERST, Douglas, Irving
111 N.W. 11th Street
Delray Beach, FL 33444 / US
02 / KHAN, Malik, J.
8603 Pinion Drive
Lake Worth, FL 33467 / US
03 / MOORE, Morris
13707 Barberry Drive
Wellington, FL 33414 / US
04 / NELSON, Leonard, E.
3213 Canal Drive
Boynton Beach, FL 33435 / US
05 / CHOI, Kwok, K.
35 S.W. 111 Lane
Coral Springs, FL 33071 / US
[1998/49]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/52]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2004/49]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [1998/49]Morgan, Marc , et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date97906002.711.02.1997
[1998/49]
WO1997US02462
Priority number, dateUS1996060556022.02.1996         Original published format: US 605560
[1998/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9731494
Date:28.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0880861
Date:02.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997
[1998/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/00, H04Q7/08
[2000/41]
Former International [1998/49]H04Q7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG DER VERFÜGBAREN FREQUENZEN IN PERSONENRUFEMPFÄNGERN[1998/49]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING AVAILABLE FREQUENCIES IN SELECTIVE CALL RECEIVERS[1998/49]
French:PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE FREQUENCES DISPONIBLES DANS DES RECEPTEURS D'APPEL SELECTIF[1998/49]
Entry into regional phase22.09.1998National basic fee paid 
22.09.1998Search fee paid 
22.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/49]
05.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/06]
27.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2001
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 17
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 18
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 19
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201620   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5065423  (GASKILL GAROLD B [US]) [Y] 1-4,6 * column 4, line 19 - line 24 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 18 * * column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 2 * [A] 5,7-10;
 [Y]US5187470  (KING RANDOLPH E [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 40 *
International search[Y]US5491469  (SCHWENDEMAN ROBERT J [US]);
 [Y]US5020130  (GRUBE GARY W [US], et al);
 [AP]US5574985  (YLIKOTILA TAAVI [FI]);
 [A]US5101508  (OWAKI MASANAO [JP]);
 [A]US5393713  (SCHWOB PIERRE R [US]);
 [A]US5206855  (SCHWENDEMAN ROBERT J [US], et al)