Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969756

EP0969756 - DEVICE FOR PREPARING COFFEE POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.03.2017  [2017/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EGRO AG
Mellingerstrasse 10
CH-5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / KARG, Anton
Neustrasse 11
CH-5406 Rütihof / CH
02 / PUDDU, Raffaele
Loorenstrasse 11
CH-5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Frauenknecht, Alois J. , et al
PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG Waldrütistrasse 21
8954 Geroldswil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Frauenknecht, Alois J. , et al
c/o PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG, Waldrütistrasse 21
8954 Geroldswil / CH
Application number, filing date97906071.213.03.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997CH00106
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840000
Date:17.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969756
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969756
Date:23.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A47J42/50, A47J42/16, A47J42/18
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesLT16.09.1999
RO16.09.1999
SI16.09.1999
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFBEREITUNG VON KAFFEEPULVER[2000/02]
English:DEVICE FOR PREPARING COFFEE POWDER[2000/02]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DE LA POUDRE DE CAFE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase16.09.1999National basic fee paid 
16.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
16.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2002Fee for grant paid
08.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
LU13.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.04.2003
[2017/13]
Former [2005/02]GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
LU13.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/39]GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
LU13.03.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/04]GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2003/42]GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
Former [2003/31]GR23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
Former [2003/29]PT23.01.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE2418473  (KRUPS FA ROBERT) [X] 1,6 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,7;
 [Y]DE3021368  (MOCK WOLFGANG DIPL PSYCH [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 2; figure . *;
 [YA]DE3343118  (OMRE CONSTR ELETTRO [IT]) [Y] 7 * page 4, paragraph 3 - paragraph 8; figure 1 * [A] 8;
 [XA]DE3903017  (HAWO S KORNMUEHLEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 52; figure - * [A] 4;
 [X]DE3535119  (MOCK WOLFGANG DIPL PSYCH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 4; figure - *;
 [A]CH393654  (ZELLWEGER USTER AG [CH]) [A] 10 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 45; figure - *;
 [A]NL54458C  (MAATSCHAPPIJ VAN BERKEL'S PATENT NV)