Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0898795

EP0898795 - HOUSING FOR AN ELECTRICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Danfoss A/S
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
[1999/09]
Inventor(s)01 / KNUDSEN, Ole, Friis
Skovhoj 25 Horuphav
DK-6470 Sydals / DK
[1999/09]
Application number, filing date97906086.020.02.1997
[1999/09]
WO1997DK00076
Priority number, dateDE199610729927.02.1996         Original published format: DE 19607299
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9732363
Date:04.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0898795
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997
[1999/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0898795
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE04.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/52, H01R13/40
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesBE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/09]
TitleGerman:GEHÄUSE FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT[1999/09]
English:HOUSING FOR AN ELECTRICAL DEVICE[1999/09]
French:BOITIER POUR DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE[1999/09]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1998National basic fee paid 
31.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
31.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
30.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2000Fee for grant paid
10.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
FR12.04.2000
IT12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]BE12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
FR12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
Former [2003/09]BE12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2002/27]BE12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/16]BE12.04.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/11]BE12.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US5090919  (TSUJI HIDEAKI [JP]);
 [A]US5266054  (DUNCAN FRANK L [US], et al);
 [A]US4083902  (CLYDE A LOFDAHL);
 [A]US3571779  (COLLIER JOHN COVELL);
 [A]SE375654  (BUNKER RAMO [US])