Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968530

EP0968530 - MICRO-ELECTROMECHANICAL RELAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
1201 East California Boulevard
Pasadena
California 91125 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
1201 East California Boulevard
Pasadena California 91125 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TAI, Yu-Chong
369 S. Grand Oaks
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
02 / WRIGHT, John, A.
Apartment 17,1001 East Villa
Pasadena, CA 91125 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Charig, Raymond Julian
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Charig, Raymond Julian
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date97906500.004.02.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US01885
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9834269
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968530
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/78, H01H50/00
[2001/17]
Former International [2000/01]H01L21/78
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:MIKRO-ELEKTROMECHANISCHES RELAIS[2000/01]
English:MICRO-ELECTROMECHANICAL RELAYS[2000/01]
French:RELAIS MICRO-ELECTROMECANIQUES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase21.08.1999National basic fee paid 
21.08.1999Search fee paid 
21.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
31.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
05.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5070317  (BHAGAT JAYANT K) [Y] 3,8,12,21,25,29 * column 4, line 10 - line 25 *;
 [Y]JPH0745175  ;
 [Y]US3676742  (RUSSELL LEWIS K ET AL) [Y] 16,17,33,34 * column 2, line 22 - line 60 *;
 [XY]  - TAYLOR W P ET AL, "A PACKAGING COMPATIBLE FULLY INTEGRATED MICROMACHINED RELAY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROELECTRONICS, (19961008), pages 202 - 207, XP000675137 [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11,13,14,18,19,22-24,26,28,30,31 * page 203, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [Y] 3,8,10,12,15-17,20,25,27,29,32-34
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP07045175 A 19950214 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 10,27 * abstract *
 [Y]  - JIN JIN GU ET AL, "CONSTRICTION RESISTANCE OF MICROCONE-BASED CONTACTS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS, PACKAGING AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY: PART A,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (19950601), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 1070-9886, pages 385 - 389, XP000508436 [Y] 15,32 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/95.390321
 [DA]  - HOSAKA H ET AL, "ELECTROMAGNETIC MICRORELAYS: CONCEPTS AND FUNDAMENTAL CHARACTERISTICS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORKSHOP ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19930207), vol. WORKSHOP 6, ISBN 0-7803-0957-X, pages 12 - 17, XP000366848 [DA] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.1993.296943
International search[Y]US5578076  ;
 [Y]US4721986  ;
 [Y]US4620123