Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0880670

EP0880670 - GRIDDED MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robell, Glenn
2621 S.W. 167th Place
Seattle, WA 98166 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/49]For all designated states
Robell, Glenn
2621 S.W. 16th Place
Seattle, WA 98166 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/49]
Representative(s)Lee, Nicholas John
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/49]Lee, Nicholas John
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date97906531.513.02.1997
[1998/49]
WO1997US02057
Priority number, dateUS1996059998614.02.1996         Original published format: US 599986
[1998/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9730325
Date:21.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0880670
Date:02.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997
[1998/49]
Search report(s)International search reportUS21.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01B3/00, E04C2/04, G01B3/02
[2001/06]
Former International [1998/49]G01B3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/49]
TitleGerman:QUADRIERTES MESSSYSTEM FÜR BAUMATERIALIEN[1998/49]
English:GRIDDED MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS[1998/49]
French:SYSTEME DE MESURE QUADRILLE POUR MATERIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION[1998/49]
Entry into regional phase14.09.1998National basic fee paid 
14.09.1998Search fee paid 
14.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/49]
29.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
02.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200206   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4858402  (PUTZ HELMAR [AT]) [Y] 1-16 * column W *;
 [Y]US4924644  (LEWIS DAVID L [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column W *
International search[Y]US4858402  (PUTZ HELMAR [AT]);
 [Y]US4827621  (BORSUK PHILIP [US]);
 [A]US5282317  (CARTER DORIS [US], et al);
 [A]US2375427  (PHILIP MANNINO);
 [A]US752617
by applicantUS5206965
 US5265342