blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0956246 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0956246



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
12.06.1997 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 12
12.06.1997 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 29
12.06.1997 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 16
12.06.1997 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 10
12.06.1997 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 4
15.01.1998 Priority document Search / examination 24
15.01.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
15.01.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.03.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.02.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 12
15.02.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
15.02.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
15.02.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
11.08.1999 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
11.08.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.08.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.10.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
14.03.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
14.03.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.04.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.05.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
16.08.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 8
20.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.08.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.10.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.10.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1