blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0956246


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.10.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
19.10.2001 (Expected) grant published on  05.12.2001 [2001/49]
12.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.06.2001 Communication of intention to grant
18.05.2001 Communication of intention to grant
18.05.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.03.2001 First examination report
12.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant
08.03.2001 Renewal fee
09.03.2000 Renewal fee
01.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.11.1999 [1999/46]
01.10.1999 Supplementary search report published on  17.11.1999 [1999/46]
01.10.1999 Request for examination filed published on  17.11.1999 [1999/46]
06.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.03.1999 Renewal fee
23.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication