blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0956246
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3369575BGlobal Dossier 20.01.2003B2
JP2000501362 08.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0956246Global Dossier 05.12.2001B1
EP0956246 17.11.1999A4
EP0956246 17.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT210057T 15.12.2001T
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU710312B 16.09.1999B2
AU2121297 02.02.1998A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9711956 24.08.1999A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69708920D 17.01.2002D1
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69708920T 01.08.2002T2
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0956246T 02.04.2002T3
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
US9702130 10.02.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9801367Global Dossier 15.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2259444 15.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1087260C 10.07.2002C
CN1225066 04.08.1999A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2168607T 16.06.2002T3
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID17924 05.02.1998A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IN188454 28.09.2002B
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100318692B 28.12.2001B1
KR20000023590 25.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY141376 16.04.2010A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT956246E 31.05.2002E
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5699940 23.12.1997A
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9704253 11.12.1997B
Priority number Date
US67656896 08.07.1996