Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0956246

EP0956246 - DUAL ACTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.H.& I. Technologies, Inc.
2nd floor, 725 E. Main Street
Santa Paula, CA 93060 / US
For all designated states
Clark, James E.
2nd floor, 725 E. Main Street
Santa Paula, CA 93060 / US
[1999/46]
Inventor(s)01 / CLARK, James, E.
2nd floor, 725 E. Main Street
Santa Paula, CA 93060 / US
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Casey, Lindsay Joseph , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]Casey, Lindsay Joseph , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date97906550.510.02.1997
[1999/46]
WO1997US02130
Priority number, dateUS1996067656808.07.1996         Original published format: US 676568
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9801367
Date:15.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0956246
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[1999/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0956246
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D83/00, B67D5/02, B67D5/54
[1999/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/46]
TitleGerman:DOPPELVENTIL[1999/46]
English:DUAL ACTION VALVE[1999/46]
French:VANNE A DOUBLE D'ACTION[1999/46]
Entry into regional phase08.02.1999National basic fee paid 
08.02.1999Search fee paid 
08.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/46]
14.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2001Fee for grant paid
03.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2346488  (TECALEMIT GMBH DEUTSCHE) [A] 1 * page 13, line 1 - page 14; figure 1 *
International search[A]US5450881  (PATTERSON DAVID R [US]);
 [A]US5437202  (CLARK JAMES E II [US]);
 [A]US5234037  (DERBY NORWIN C [US]);
 [A]US2972342  (OWEN FREDERICK E);
 [A]US5560407  (SWINFORD MARK D [US])
by applicantUS5437202