Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0890067

EP0890067 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DRYING A COATING ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YONKOSKI, Roger, K.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / STROBUSH, Brian, L.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / LUDEMANN, Thomas, J.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / YAPEL, Robert, A.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[1999/02]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/02]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97906677.621.02.1997
[1999/02]
WO1997US02590
Priority number, dateUS1996062416429.03.1996         Original published format: US 624164
[1999/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9737181
Date:09.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0890067
Date:13.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997
[1999/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0890067
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:F26B13/10, G03C1/74
[1999/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   IT,   NL [1999/02]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TROCKNUNG EINER BESCHICHTIGUNG AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT[1999/02]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DRYING A COATING ON A SUBSTRATE[1999/02]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SECHAGE D'UN REVETEMENT APPOSE SUR UN SUBSTRAT[1999/02]
Entry into regional phase14.10.1998National basic fee paid 
14.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.09.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
14.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/02]
03.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.02.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
11.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1999Fee for grant paid
13.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US5394622  (EVANS KENT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column W *;
 [A]GB365922  (RICHARD SCHROEDER, et al) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2107275  (ANDERSON WILLIAM T, et al) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS61217037  ;
 [A]DE2240713  (STUMM ERIC HENRI GEOFFROY DIPL);
 [A]US5290504  (MILKOVICH STEPHEN A [US], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870214), vol. 11, no. 49, Database accession no. (P - 547)<2496> ,