Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0877986

EP0877986 - COMPUTER-ASSISTED METHOD OF SEGMENTING AN ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT FOR A NETWORK DATA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FETIH, Evelyn
Rathausstrasse 16
D-82024 Taufkirchen / DE
02 / PIEH, Odile
Weissenburger Strasse 16
D-81667 München / DE
[1998/47]
Application number, filing date97907033.129.01.1997
[1998/47]
WO1997DE00176
Priority number, dateDE199610380702.02.1996         Original published format: DE 19603807
[1998/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9728497
Date:07.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0877986
Date:18.11.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997
[1998/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0877986
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, H04L29/06
[1999/33]
Former International [1998/47]G06F17/21, H04L29/00, H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUFTEILEN EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN DOKUMENTS FÜR EIN NETZWERKINFORMATIONSSYSTEM MIT HILFE EINES RECHNERS[1998/47]
English:COMPUTER-ASSISTED METHOD OF SEGMENTING AN ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT FOR A NETWORK DATA SYSTEM[1998/47]
French:PROCEDE DE REPARTITION D'UN DOCUMENT ELECTRONIQUE POUR UN SYSTEME D'INFORMATION DE RESEAU A L'AIDE D'UN ORDINATEUR[1998/47]
Entry into regional phase20.07.1998National basic fee paid 
20.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/47]
10.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.1999Fee for grant paid
18.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT19.04.2000
[2008/07]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0501770  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * claims 1-3,6,7,10 *;
 [A]  - ROUSSEAU B ET AL, "WRITING DOCUMENTS FOR PAPER AND WWW A STRATEGY BASED ON FRAMEMAKER AND WEBMAKER", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (19940101), vol. 27, pages 205 - 214, XP000571730 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [01.0] - paragraph [01.2] * * paragraph [2.2.1] * * paragraph [03.0] - paragraph [03.2] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(94)90134-1
 [A]  - EICHMANN, MCGREGOR, DANLEY, "Integrating structured databases into the Web: The MORE system", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, HOUSTON, (19941101), XP002038112 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [04.0] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(94)90142-2
 [A]  - BAENTSCH, MOLTER, STURM, "WebMake: Integrating distributed software development in a structure-enhanced Web", COMPUTER NETWORK AND ISDN SYSTEMS, KAISERSLAUTERN, (19950401), XP002038113 [A] 1,2,5-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [02.1] * * figures 1-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00019-4
 [A]  - SLATER A F, "EXTENDING W3 CLIENTS", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (19951201), vol. 28, no. 1/02, pages 61 - 68, XP000542207 [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.2] - paragraph [02.4] * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00116-4