Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891251

EP0891251 - PRESS WITH A HYDRAULIC PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Feintool International Holding
Industriering 8
3250 Lyss / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Feintool International Holding
Industriering 3
CH-3250 Lyss / CH
Inventor(s)01 / WYMANN, Hans
Baumgartenweg 5
CH-3250 Lyss / CH
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Weiss, Peter , et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Weiss, Peter , et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Former [1999/03]Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. , et al
Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date97907100.814.03.1997
[1999/03]
WO1997EP01303
Priority number, dateDE199611224227.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19612242
[1999/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9735710
Date:02.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0891251
Date:20.01.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997
[1999/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891251
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:B30B15/06, B30B15/02, B21D37/14
[1999/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/03]
TitleGerman:PRESSE MIT EINER HYDRAULIKPLATTE[1999/03]
English:PRESS WITH A HYDRAULIC PLATE[1999/03]
French:PRESSE A PLATEAU HYDRAULIQUE[1999/03]
Entry into regional phase02.10.1998National basic fee paid 
02.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/03]
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1999Fee for grant paid
01.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
FR05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2003/46]ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2003/09]ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2002/27]ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2002/23]FI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/29]FI05.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/11]BE31.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/09]PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE4343336  (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 5-10;
 [YD]EP0201456  (FEINTOOL INT HOLDING [CH]) [YD] 5-7 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 13; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0241933  (BRUDERER MASCHINENFABRIK AG E [CH]) [Y] 8-10 * figure 3 *;
 [X]DE3925731  (KLETSCH STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure -; claims 1,8 *;
 [X]DE3935498  (INNOVATIONS PROJEKTE AG [CH]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 23; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2738081  (SCHULER GMBH L) [A] 1,5-10 * figure - *;
 [AD]EP0183648  (FEINTOOL AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * abstract *