Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0883777

EP0883777 - HIGH-HEAT TRANSFER, LOW-NOx COMBUSTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institute of Gas Technology
1700 South Mount Prospect Road
Des Plaines, IL 60018 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]For all designated states
INSTITUTE OF GAS TECHNOLOGY
1700 South Mount Prospect Road
Des Plaines, IL 60018 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KHINKIS, Mark, J.
8943 N. Birch
Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US
02 / ABBASI, Hamid, A.
7309 Bunker Road
Darien, IL 60559 / US
03 / GROSMAN, Roman, E.
1125 Hunter Street
Lombard, IL 60148 / US
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Cioni, Carlo
PIPPARELLI & PARTNERS Via Quadronno, 6
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Cioni, Carlo
c/o STUDIO CIONI & PIPPARELLI Viale Caldara 38
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date97907953.028.02.1997
[1998/51]
WO1997US03196
Priority number, dateUS1996060906529.02.1996         Original published format: US 609065
[1998/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9732162
Date:04.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0883777
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997
[1998/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0883777
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:F23C6/04, F23C3/00, F23C7/06, F23L15/04, F23L7/00
[1998/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/51]
TitleGerman:VERBRENNUNGSSYSTEM MIT HOHER WÄRMETRANSMISSION UND NIEDRIGEM NOx-GEHALT[1998/51]
English:HIGH-HEAT TRANSFER, LOW-NOx COMBUSTION SYSTEM[1998/51]
French:SYSTEME DE COMBUSTION A FAIBLE EMISSION D'OXYDES D'AZOTE ET FORT TRANSFERT THERMIQUE[1998/51]
Entry into regional phase29.09.1998National basic fee paid 
29.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/51]
19.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.1999Fee for grant paid
06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPS63315814  ;
 [Y]WO9002907  (AMERICAN COMBUSTION INC [US]) [Y] 2,3,5,11,14 * page 4, line 3 - page 4, line 31 * * page 6, line 7 - page 6, line 23 * * page 10, line 2 - page 11, line 26 * * figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US5248252  (DELICHATSIOS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9,11 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 19 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE9000960U  (VAILLANT) [A] 5 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0463277  (INST GAS TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 5,10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0644374  (BOC GROUP INC [US]);
 [A]WO9516880  (MAXON CORP [US]);
 [A]US3656878  (WRIGHT FRANKLIN J);
 [A]EP0293168  (NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KK [JP])
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890414), vol. 13, no. 154, Database accession no. (M - 814), [X] 1,8,9,13,16 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5,11,14