Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0893964

EP0893964 - VACUUM CLEANER WITH A CHAMBER FOR HOLDING THE DUST BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH
Mühlenweg 17-37
42275 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
VORWERK & CO. INTERHOLDING GmbH
Mühlenweg 17-37
42275 Wuppertal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JACOBS, Carsten
Wittener Strasse 248
D-45549 Sprockhövel / DE
02 / ARNOLD, Hans-Peter
Kastanienallee 43
D-42489 Wülfrath / DE
03 / DELSEITH, Petra
Rather Kopf 61
D-42855 Remseheid / DE
04 / KRAPP, Jan, Thomas
Steinhauser Strasse 29
D-42399 Wuppertal / DE
[1999/05]
Representative(s)Müller, Enno , et al
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date97908167.604.03.1997
[1999/05]
WO1997EP01072
Priority number, dateDE199611351104.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19613511
[1999/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9737578
Date:16.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0893964
Date:03.02.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997
[1999/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0893964
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47L9/14
[1999/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/05]
TitleGerman:STAUBSAUGER MIT EINER KAMMER ZUR AUFNAHME EINES STAUBFILTERBEUTELS[1999/05]
English:VACUUM CLEANER WITH A CHAMBER FOR HOLDING THE DUST BAG[1999/05]
French:ASPIRATEUR POURVU D'UN LOGEMENT POUR SAC-FILTRE A POUSSIERE[1999/05]
Entry into regional phase02.10.1998National basic fee paid 
02.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/05]
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.1999Fee for grant paid
25.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9515108  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE], et al) [DA] 1,17 * page 35, line 1212 - page 36, line 1242; figures 1,11,20; claims 12,13 *;
 [A]DE2406914  (MIELE & CIE) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0045036  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE8706811U  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE8406447U  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * abstract *