EP0891287 - DEVICE FOR ORIENTING FLAT DESPATCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK, Werner Kornblumenweg 6 D-78479 Reichenau / DE | [1999/03] | Application number, filing date | 97908269.0 | 20.03.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997EP01394 | Priority number, date | DE1996112567 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19612567 | [1999/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736810 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891287 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891287 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/24, B65H9/00, B65H1/14 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
B65H1/025 (EP);
B65H1/24 (EP);
B65H9/00 (EP);
B65H2511/214 (EP);
B65H2513/512 (EP);
B65H2701/1916 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/214, B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2513/512, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN VON FLACHEN SENDUNGEN | [1999/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR ORIENTING FLAT DESPATCHES | [1999/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ALIGNEMENT D'ARTICLES EXPEDIES PLATS | [1999/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3598400 (NELSON CARL R) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 1 - line 65 *; | [A]US4595188 (WILEY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document * |