Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968270

EP0968270 - TRANSITION METAL COMPLEX-CONTAINING SYSTEMS AS ACTIVATORS FOR PEROXIDE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SPECKMANN, Horst-Dieter
Eichenfeldstrasse 24a
D-40764 Langenfeld / DE
02 / BLUM, Helmut
Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 30
D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / HILL, Karlheinz
Eibenweg 22
D-40699 Erkrath / DE
04 / MAYER, Bernd
Hospitalstrasse 18
D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE
05 / NITSCH, Christian
Otto-Hahn-Strasse 185
D-40591 Düsseldorf / DE
06 / PEGELOW, Ulrich
Benrodestrasse 33
D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE
07 / RIEBE, Hans-Jürgen
Spreestrasse 40
D-42697 Solingen / DE
08 / WILDE, Andreas
Bahlenstrasse 134
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date97908290.624.03.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997EP01481
Priority number, dateDE199611310301.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19613103
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9736987
Date:09.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968270
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/39, D06L3/02, A01N59/00, A61K7/135, C11D3/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ÜBERGANGSMETALLKOMPLEX-HALTIGE SYSTEME ALS AKTIVATOREN FÜR PERSAUERSTOFFVERBINDUNGEN[2000/01]
English:TRANSITION METAL COMPLEX-CONTAINING SYSTEMS AS ACTIVATORS FOR PEROXIDE COMPOUNDS[2000/01]
French:SYSTEMES CONTENANT DES COMPLEXES DE METAUX DE TRANSITION COMME ACTIVATEURS POUR LES COMPOSES PEROXYDE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1998National basic fee paid 
23.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.1998Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
22.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9527775  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DX] 1-21 * page 2, line 24 - page 14, line 16; examples 1-3; claims 1-9 *;
 [DX]EP0458397  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DX] 1-21 * page 2, line 49 - page 13, line 8; examples 8,9; claims 1-24 *;
 [X]DE3002271  (WASCHMITTELWERK GENTHIN STAMMB [DD]) [X] 1-21 * page 7, line 14 - page 11, line 4; examples 1-4; claims 1-9 *;
 [X]WO9606155  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 2, line 27 - page 13, line 6; examples 1,2; claims 1-15 *;
 [PX]WO9623861  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1-3,5-8,14,20 * page 9, line 12 - page 12, line 21; examples 1,7,8; claims 1-13 *;
 [PX]WO9700311  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1-3,5-8,14,20 * page 9, line 3 - page 22, line 4; examples 1,7,8; claims 1-13 *;
 [PX]WO9700312  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1-3,5-8,14,20 * page 8, line 15 - page 21, line 13; examples 1,7,8; claims 1-17 *
Examination WO9716521
  WO9722680
  WO9722681