blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0898493

EP0898493 - APPARATUS WITH ELECTRODE ARRAYS FOR CARRYING OUT CHEMICAL, PHYSICAL OR PHYSICO-CHEMICAL REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Wales, Bangor
College Road
Bangor LL57 2DG / GB
[1999/09]
Inventor(s)01 / PETHIG, Ronald
Lleyn Telford Road, Menai Bridge
Anglesey, Gwynedd LL59 5DT / GB
02 / BURT, Julian, Paul, Hillhouse
19 Chapel Row
Broad Lane, Rochdale OL16 4QQ / GB
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafent & Co., 9 Staple Inn
London WC1V 7QH / GB
Application number, filing date97908364.918.03.1997
[1999/09]
WO1997GB00753
Priority number, dateGB1996000562818.03.1996         Original published format: GB 9605628
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9734689
Date:25.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0898493
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0898493
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:B01J19/00, B03C5/02
[1999/09]
CPC:
B03C5/028 (EP); B01J19/0093 (EP); B03C5/026 (EP);
B01J2219/00853 (EP); B01J2219/00889 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/09]
Extension statesLT28.09.1998
LV28.09.1998
SI28.09.1998
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG MIT ELEKTRODENREIHEN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON CHEMISCHEN, PHYSIKALISCHEN ODER PHYSIKALISCH-CHEMISCHEN REAKTIONEN[1999/09]
English:APPARATUS WITH ELECTRODE ARRAYS FOR CARRYING OUT CHEMICAL, PHYSICAL OR PHYSICO-CHEMICAL REACTIONS[1999/09]
French:APPAREIL A RESEAU D'ELECTRODES SERVANT A EFFECTUER DES REACTIONS CHIMIQUES, PHYSIQUES OU PHYSICO-CHIMIQUES[1999/09]
Entry into regional phase28.09.1998National basic fee paid 
28.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
10.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.1999Fee for grant paid
25.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199903   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/18]PT19.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/17]MC31.03.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/24]PT19.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/09]PT19.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9207657  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [XA]DE4127405  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,6;
 [DA]WO9316383  (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB]) [DA] 4-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0645169  (AJDARI ARMAND [FR], et al) [A] 5,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4400955  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 [DPX]  - M.WARD, "Devilish tricks with tiny chips", NEW SCIENTIST, LONDON GB, (19970301), vol. 153, no. 2071, pages 22 - 26, XP002034150 [DPX] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [DPX]  - B.R.MARX, "Micromachined chip may identify micro-organisms fast", LASER FOCUS WORLD, TULSA US, (199701), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 19 - 20, XP000677689 [DPX] 1-8 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.